IL HB5330 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1075
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1075
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Requires the State Superintendent of Education to appoint a committee to review the tests administered by the State Board of Education and national, statewide, and local assessments administered by school districts. Sets forth the membership of the committee and the issues that the committee must review. Requires the committee to annually report and make recommendations to the State Superintendent of Education and the General Assembly. Requires the reports to be posted on the State Board's Internet website and to be available for public review. Effective July 1, 2014.
Title
SCH CD-ASSESSMENT REVIEW COMM
Sponsors
Rep. Linda LaVia [D] | Rep. Sandra Pihos [R] | Rep. Monique Davis [D] | Sen. Kimberly Lightford [D] |
Sen. Susan Rezin [R] | Sen. Steven Landek [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-29 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 109 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 97 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 97 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-26 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1075 |
2014-08-26 | House | Effective Date August 26, 2014 |
2014-08-26 | House | Governor Approved |
2014-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2014-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-29 | House | House Concurs |
2014-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 109-007-000 |
2014-05-27 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 011-000-000 |
2014-05-26 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2014-05-22 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-22 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2014-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2014-05-21 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2014 |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Lightford |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 013-000-000 |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 30, 2014 |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 011-000-000 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 29, 2014 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2014-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2014-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2014-04-10 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 097-009-000 |
2014-04-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted |
2014-04-09 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos |
2014-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 014-000-000 |
2014-04-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2014-04-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2014-04-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2014-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2014-04-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2014-03-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2014-03-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-20 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 012-000-000 |
2014-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; by Voice Vote |
2014-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2014-03-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2014-03-03 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2014-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |