IL HB5343 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-31 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-31 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Worker Adjustment and Retraining Act. Provides that employers employing 100 or more full-time employees shall provide severance pay to employees. Provides that employers that employ 100 or more full-time workers must provide notice 90 days, rather than 60 days, before a layoff order takes effect. Effective immediately.
Title
MASS LAYOFF SEVERANCE PAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5343&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5343.htm |