IL HB5350 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that the maximum income limitation under the Low-Income Senior Citizens Assessment Freeze Homestead Exemption shall be adjusted each year by the annual cost of living increase, if any, in Social Security and Supplemental Security Income benefits that took effect during the immediately preceding calendar year. Amends the Energy Assistance Act. Provides that eligibility limits under the energy assistance program may not exceed the greater of (1) 150% of the federal nonfarm poverty level as established by the federal Office of Management and Budget or 60% of the State median income for the current State fiscal year as established by the U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, whichever is higher; or (2) the eligibility limit for the immediately preceding calendar year, increased by the annual cost of living increase, if any, in Social Security and Supplemental Security Income benefits that took effect during the immediately preceding calendar year. Effective immediately.
Title
REVENUE-SENIOR FREEZE-LIHEAP
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris |
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2024-03-08 | House | To Revenue - Property Tax Subcommittee |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 20 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 15-172 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5350&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB5350.htm |