IL HB5353 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1001
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1001
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Wildlife Code. Provides that wild turkey and deer hunting permits shall be issued without charge to children, grandchildren, parents, grandparents, brothers, or sisters that permanently reside on lands with an Illinois landowner who owns or a resident tenant that resides on at least 40 acres of Illinois land.
Title
PERMIT-RELATIVES OF LANDOWNERS
Sponsors
Rep. Rich Brauer [R] | Sen. Larry Bomke [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-17 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1001 |
2012-08-17 | House | Effective Date August 17, 2012 |
2012-08-17 | House | Governor Approved |
2012-06-20 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2012-05-22 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2012-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 3, 2012 |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 19, 2012 |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Do Pass Agriculture and Conservation; 007-000-000 |
2012-04-11 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture and Conservation |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-03-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Larry K. Bomke |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 23, 2012 |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2012-03-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2012-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-06 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 015-000-000 |
2012-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Agriculture & Conservation Committee; by Voice Vote |
2012-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2012-03-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rich Brauer |
2012-02-17 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2012-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2012-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rich Brauer |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
520 | 5 | 2.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
520 | 5 | 2.26 | Amended Code | Citation Text |