IL HB5370 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0711
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0711
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Requires that upon approaching an emergency scene, a stationary authorized emergency vehicle, or a construction or maintenance area or zone, a person who drives a vehicle shall, proceeding with due caution, yield the right-of-way by making a lane change, if possible with due regard to safety and traffic conditions, if on a highway having at least 4 lanes with not less than 2 lanes proceeding in the same direction as the approaching vehicle reduce the speed of the vehicle to a speed that is reasonable and proper with regard to traffic conditions and the use of the highway to avoid a collision and leaving a safe distance until safely past the stationary authorized emergency vehicle, or construction or maintenance area or zone. Provides that if changing lanes would be impossible or unsafe, proceeding with due caution, reduce the speed of the vehicle to a speed that is reasonable and proper with regard to traffic conditions and the use of the highway to avoid a collision, or until safely past the construction or maintenance area or zone.
Title
VEH CD-EMERGENCY/CONSTRUCTION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-19 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0711 |
2024-07-19 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2025 |
2024-07-19 | House | Governor Approved |
2024-06-13 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2024-06-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2024-05-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2024-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Andrew S. Chesney |
2024-05-16 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 7, 2024 |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2024 |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 013-000-000 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William E Hauter |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson |
2024-04-17 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2024-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-11 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting |
2024-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tracy Katz Muhl |
2024-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2024-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; 011-000-000 |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 11-907 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 11-908 | Amended Code | Citation Text |