IL HB5442 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-13 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-13 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Open Meetings Act. Provides that, for the purposes of the Act, "public body" does not include a Metropolitan Enforcement Group (MEG) Policy Board or drug task force composed or created by any combination of local law enforcement agencies. Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a person commits drug-induced homicide when he or she violates delivery of a controlled substance or methamphetamine or a similar law of another jurisdiction, by unlawfully delivering a controlled substance to another, and the injection, inhalation, absorption, or ingestion of any amount of that controlled substance is a contributing cause of the person's death. Amends the Illinois Controlled Substances Act. Provides that controlled substances which are lawfully administered in hospitals or institutions licensed under the Hospital Licensing Act shall be reported under (rather than, exempt from) specified reporting provisions under the Act, and the prescription for the controlled substances ordered and the quantity actually administered (rather than, the reporting requirement only applies for more than a 72-hour supply of a discharge medication to be consumed outside of the hospital or institution). Provides that the information required to be transmitted under the prescription monitoring program must be transmitted not later than the end of the business day on which a controlled substance is dispensed, or at such other time as may be required by the Department of Human Services by administrative rule (rather than, at the end of the next business day on which the controlled substance is dispensed).
Title
CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE-REPORTING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-12 | House | Tabled |
2018-04-12 | House | Tabled Pursuant to Rule 22(g)-5 |
2018-04-12 | House | Motion Do Not Pass Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 003-002-000; -SUBCOMMITTEE |
2018-04-12 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2018-04-12 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-04-10 | House | Motion Filed to Discharge Committee Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Jim Durkin |
2018-04-09 | House | To Sentencing, Penalties and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin |
2018-03-05 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 120 | 1.02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 9-3.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 570 | 313 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 570 | 316 | Amended Code | Citation Text |