IL HB5457 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Paint Stewardship Act. Requires each producer to join the representative organization. Requires the representative organization to submit a plan to the Director of the Environmental Protection Agency for the establishment of a paint stewardship program. Sets forth requirements for the program. Requires the representative organization, in conjunction with an independent auditor, to propose, and the Agency to approve, a fee that will be added to the cost of all architectural paint sold to retailers and distributors in this State. Creates a state-action antitrust exemption for actions taken under the Act. Prohibits, after the implementation of the paint stewardship program, a producer, distributor, or retailer from selling or offering for sale architectural paint to any person in the State if the producer is not a member of the representative organization. Authorizes the imposition of civil penalties for violations of the Act. Sets forth fees for the program. Provides that no person shall incinerate architectural paint or industrial maintenance coatings in this State after July 1, 2016. Effective on January 1, 2015.
Title
PAINT STEWARDSHIP ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-03-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-27 | House | Assigned to Environment |
2014-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5457&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB5457.htm |