IL HB5459 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0716
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0716
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Utilities Act. Provides that in the case of a public utility that provides drinking water services, upon the request of a municipal wastewater agency or unit of local government organized under specified Acts, such public utility shall provide timely and accurate water usage data, in a format identifiable to the requester, for purposes of calculating wastewater billings. Provides that the public utility shall be entitled to collect its reasonable costs incurred to provide such data.
Title
UTIL-WATER USAGE DATA
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-19 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0716 |
2024-07-19 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2025 |
2024-07-19 | House | Governor Approved |
2024-06-13 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2024-05-16 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-002-000 |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2024 |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Energy and Public Utilities; 010-000-000 |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024 |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 30, 2024 |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-17 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2024-04-12 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-12 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-02 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Public Utilities Committee; 016-000-000 |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Public Utilities Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Nabeela Syed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 5 | 5-106 | Amended Code | Citation Text |