IL HB5499 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Critical Health Problems and Comprehensive Health Education Act. Provides that gambling and gambling addiction shall be included in the Comprehensive Health Education Program. Effective July 1, 2024.
Title
COMP HEALTH EDUCATION-GAMBLING
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Olickal [D] | Rep. Amy Grant [R] | Rep. Janet Yang Rohr [D] | Rep. Theresa Mah [D] |
Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] | Rep. Will Guzzardi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned to Gaming Committee |
2024-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2024-03-08 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2024-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2024-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2024-03-06 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Amy L. Grant |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy L. Grant |
2024-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 110 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5499&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB5499.htm |