IL HB5514 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Power Agency Act. Authorizes the Illinois Power Agency to develop a high voltage direct current (HVDC) renewable energy credit procurement for HVDC renewable energy credits. Provides that, within 120 days after the effective date of the amendatory Act, the Agency shall develop a HVDC renewable energy credit procurement plan limited to the procurement of HVDC renewable energy credits. Sets forth requirements and procedures for the procurement plan. Amends the Public Utilities Act to make conforming changes.
Title
UTILITIES-HIGH VOLTAGE CREDITS
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Public Utilities Committee |
2024-03-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Public Utilities Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3855 | 1-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3855 | 1-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3855 | 1-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3855 | 1-75 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 16-108 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 16-111.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |