IL HB5515 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Freedom of Information Act. Provides that the exemption to the copying and inspection requirements of the Act for records relating to or affecting the security of correctional institutions and detention facilities includes, but is not limited to, law enforcement records of persons in the custody of or committed to the Department of Corrections. Exempts from disclosure records requested by persons committed to the Department of Corrections if those materials include, among other things, law enforcement records of persons in the custody of or committed to the Department of Corrections. Effective immediately.
Title
FOIA-LAW ENFORCEMENT RECORDS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-07 | House | To Sentencing, Penalties, and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 140 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5515&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB5515.htm |