IL HB5626 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-30 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-30 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $6,807,000 to the Auditor General to meet the ordinary and contingent expenses of the office of the Auditor General. Appropriates $25,978,477 from the Audit Expense Fund to the Auditor General for administrative and operations expenses and audits, studies, investigations, and expenses related to actuarial services. Effective July 1, 2016.
Title
$AUDITOR GEN
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Rita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-30 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2016 |
2016-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-05 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-General Services Committee; 011-005-000 |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita |