IL HB5660 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Assistance Fraud Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Increases the criminal and civil penalties for medical assistance fraud committed by individuals and corporations.
Title
MEDICAID FRAUD-PENALTIES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-10 | House | To HS Medicaid Subcommittee |
2018-04-10 | House | Remains in Human Services Committee |
2018-04-10 | House | Motion Do Pass - Lost Human Services Committee; 005-002-000 |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 8A-11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 8A-16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 8A-17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 8A-2.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 8A-6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 8A-7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5660&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5660.htm |