IL HB5776 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Higher Education Green Jobs and Technology Act. Permits public community colleges to establish green jobs certificate programs for workers in certain industries, including the energy efficient building industry, construction and retrofitting, the renewable electrical power industry, the energy efficient vehicle industry, the biofuel industry, and sustainable product manufacturing (subject to Board of Higher Education approval as provided under the Board of Higher Education Act). Effective immediately.
Title
COM COL-GREEN JOBS CERTIFICATE
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Demmer [R] | Sen. Elgie Sims [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-03-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-27 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2014-02-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2014-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Demmer |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5776&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB5776.htm |