IL HB5789 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates the amount of $709,500 from the General Revenue Fund to the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity for a grant to the Forest Preserve District of Cook County for the administration and operation of Greencorps Chicago and Forest Preserve Experience programs within the Conservation Corps program. Effective July 1, 2024.
Title
$DCEO-FOREST PRESERVE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kimberly Du Buclet |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris |
2024-04-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2024-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner |
2024-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William "Will" Davis |
2024-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2024-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2024-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols |
2024-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2024-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2024-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty |
2024-03-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-22 | House | First Reading |
2024-03-22 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5789&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/PDF/10300HB5789.pdf |