IL HB5858 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0936
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0936
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that the prohibitions of the statute concerning tattooing the body of a minor do not apply to the removal of a tattoo from a person under 18 years of age, who is a victim of trafficking in persons, involuntary sexual servitude of a minor, or involuntary servitude or who is or has been a streetgang member as defined in the Illinois Streetgang Terrorism Omnibus Prevention Act, if the removal of the tattoo is performed in an establishment or multi-type establishment which has received a certificate of registration from the Department of Public Health or its agent under the Tattoo and Body Piercing Establishment Registration Act and the removal of the tattoo is performed by the operator or an authorized employee of the operator of the establishment or multi-type establishment. Effective immediately.
Title
CRIM CD-TATTOO REMOVAL-MINOR
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-15 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0936 |
2014-08-15 | House | Effective Date August 15, 2014 |
2014-08-15 | House | Governor Approved |
2014-06-20 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-23 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Jacobs |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2014 |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 8, 2014 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 010-000-000 |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 2, 2014 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2014-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2014-04-01 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2014-04-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
2014-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher |
2014-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2014-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2014-03-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-20 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary; 016-000-000 |
2014-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
2014-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2014-02-24 | House | Assigned to Judiciary |
2014-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John D. Anthony |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 12-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 12C-35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |