IL HR0079 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-29 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-29 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares February 28, 2023 as Black Women's History Day in the State of Illinois to honor the accomplishments, power, beauty, courage, intelligence, ingenuity, stewardship, and leadership of Black women. Encourages all Illinoisans and their families to acknowledge, in word and in deed, the accomplishments of Black women in places where they live, work, and play, because doing so recognizes Black women's history as American history.
Title
BLACK WOMEN'S HISTORY DAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2023-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2023-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2023-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2023-03-29 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2023-03-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2023-03-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2023-03-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2023-03-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty |
2023-03-24 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty |
2023-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty |
2023-03-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2023-03-15 | House | Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000 |
2023-03-07 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2023-02-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=79&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HR/10300HR0079.htm |