IL HR0214 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares April 20, 2023 as "Survivors Speak Illinois Day". Commends the survivors and advocates of Survivors Speak Illinois for their work to stop violence and help those impacted by it.
Title
SURVIVORS SPEAK ILLINOIS DAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-26 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-05-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2023-05-09 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000 |
2023-04-25 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2023-04-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2023-04-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=214&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HR/10300HR0214.htm |