IL HR0692 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-29 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-29 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares April 18, 2024 as Tax Freedom Day.
Title
TAX FREEDOM DAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-29 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2024-04-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Christopher "C.D." Davidsmeyer |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=692&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HR/10300HR0692.htm |