IL SB0011 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates income tax credits for amounts invested by a taxpayer in a qualified new business venture, including investments made through an investment fund manager. Provides that the credit shall be equal to 25% of the amount invested. Provides that the credits may be carried forward for a period of 5 years. Provides that not more than $10,000,000 in angel investment credits may be issued per calendar year. Provides that the credits are exempt from the Act's automatic sunset provisions. Provides that the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity shall certify the qualified business ventures and investment fund managers. Sets forth certain criteria for the certification of the business venture. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-ANGEL CREDIT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2011-03-18 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive |
2011-03-10 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2011-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive |
2011-03-03 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2011-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive |
2011-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2011-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2011-02-09 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2011-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-01-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-01-27 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Kotowski |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 221 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 5 | 222 | New Code | See Bill Text |