IL SB0051 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the maximum length of a truck tractor in combination with a semitrailer may not exceed 65 feet (rather than 55 feet) overall dimension on all non-State highways. Removes the requirement that truck tractor-semitrailer combinations must have no more than a maximum 55 feet overall wheel base on Class III roadways and other non-designated State highways. Provides that the distance between the kingpin and the axle of a semitrailer longer than 48 feet, in combination with a truck tractor, may not exceed 42 feet 6 inches, unless the trailer or semitrailer is used for the transport of livestock.
Title
VEH CD-LENGTH AND SIZE REQ
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2017-04-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-05 | House | First Reading |
2017-04-05 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2017-04-05 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 15, 2017 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2017 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Transportation; 016-000-000 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Tim Bivins |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-12-05 | Senate | Prefiled with Secretary by Sen. Tim Bivins |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 15-107 | Amended Code | Citation Text |