IL SB0068 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-28 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-28 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code, the Voluntary Health Services Plans Act, and the Voluntary Health Services Plans Act to require coverage for hearing instruments and related services for all individuals when a hearing care professional prescribes a hearing instrument. Provides that an insurer shall provide coverage for up to $2,500 per hearing aid per insured's hearing impaired ear subject to certain restrictions. Provides that an insurer shall not be required to pay a claim if the insured filed such a claim 36 months prior to the date of filing the claim with the insurer and the claim was paid by any insurer. Effective immediately.
Title
INS CD - HEARING AID COVERAGE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-28 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland | |
2009-05-07 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter | |
2009-04-30 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2009 | |
2009-04-30 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2009 | |
2009-04-29 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Deanna Demuzio | |
2009-04-03 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2009-04-03 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2009-04-03 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2009-04-03 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2009 | |
2009-04-02 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. M. Maggie Crotty | |
2009-03-30 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon | |
2009-03-27 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. A. J. Wilhelmi | |
2009-03-24 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval | |
2009-03-24 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Cronin | |
2009-03-13 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 3, 2009 | |
2009-03-12 | To Insurance Subcommittee on Insurance Mandates | |
2009-03-12 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 To Insurance Subcommittee on Insurance Mandates | |
2009-03-12 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 To Insurance Subcommittee on Insurance Mandates | |
2009-03-11 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Insurance | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine | |
2009-03-05 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Insurance | |
2009-03-05 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-05 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein | |
2009-03-04 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins | |
2009-02-27 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-27 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein | |
2009-02-04 | Assigned to Insurance | |
2009-01-30 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-01-30 | First Reading | |
2009-01-30 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=68&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB0068.htm |