IL SB0068 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Downstate Police and Downstate Firefighter Articles of the Illinois Pension Code. Beginning in fiscal year 2021, sets a separate Comptroller intercept schedule for payments of State funds to pension funds that have assets in trust that exceed 5 years of current liabilities. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-COMPTROLLER INTERCEPT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Pensions |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 3-125 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 4-118 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=68&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0068.htm |