IL SB0119 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that individual and group policies of accident and health insurance or managed care plans amended, delivered, issued, or renewed after the effective date of the amendatory Act must provide coverage for maternity care.
Title
INS CD - MATERNITY CARE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2011-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance |
2011-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 8, 2011 |
2011-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2011-03-10 | Senate | To Insurance Subcommittee on Insurance Mandates and Insurance Issues |
2011-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2011-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-01-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-01-27 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |