IL SB0178 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the General Obligation Bond Act. Authorizes the issuance of an additional $120,015,000,000 in State Serial Long Term Pension Obligation Bonds. Amends the State Pension Funds Continuing Appropriation Act to create a continuing appropriation for payments on those Bonds. Amends the State Finance Act to create the State Pension Serial Long Term Obligation Bond Fund. Effective immediately.
Title
BONDS-PENSION OBLIGATION
Sponsors
Sen. Omar Aquino [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-06 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Governmental Operations |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.891 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 330 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 330 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 330 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 330 | 2.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 330 | 7.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 330 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 15 | 1.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=178&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0178.htm |