IL SB0318 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0521
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0521
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Freedom of Information Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning lists of available records.
Title
PROPERTY TAX/PENSION/SCHOOL
Sponsors
Sen. John Cullerton [D] | Sen. Dan Kotowski [D] | Sen. Andy Manar [D] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] |
Sen. Steve Stadelman [D] | Sen. Napoleon Harris [D] | Rep. Marcus Evans [D] | Rep. Barbara Currie [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 40 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 40 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 82 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-08-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 40 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 82 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-08-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-30 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0521 |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Effective Date June 1, 2017 |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2016-06-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 040-014-000 |
2016-06-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 040-014-000 |
2016-06-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2016-06-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2016-06-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2016-06-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2016-06-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2016-06-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 3 - June 30, 2016 |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 3 |
2016-06-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 082-029-000 |
2016-06-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-06-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2016-06-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Withdrawn by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2016-06-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2016-06-30 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2016-06-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2016-06-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2016-06-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2016-06-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-06-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2016-06-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2016-06-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2016-06-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-06-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2016-05-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2016 |
2016-05-27 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-25 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000 |
2016-05-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2016-05-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2016-05-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2016-05-18 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2016 |
2016-05-18 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2016-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-01-29 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 28, 2016 |
2015-12-04 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 29, 2016 |
2015-10-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) December 4, 2015 |
2015-09-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) October 31, 2015 |
2015-08-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) September 30, 2015 |
2015-08-24 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Deb Conroy |
2015-08-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2015-08-05 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2015-08-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-08-05 | House | First Reading |
2015-08-05 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2015-08-05 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 037-001-018 |
2015-08-04 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Harris |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Harris |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; J. Cullerton |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 017-000-000 |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 011-000-006 |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As August 5, 2015 |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2015-08-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2015-08-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2015-08-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-08-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015 |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2015 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2015 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2015 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-01-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 140 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |