IL SB0343 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the adjournment of the boards of review.
Title
PROP TX-ACCESSIBILITY IMPROVE
Sponsors
Sen. Terry Link [D] | Sen. Martin Sandoval [D] | Rep. Anna Moeller [D] | Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] |
Rep. Carol Sente [D] | Rep. Stephanie Kifowit [D] | Rep. Robert Rita [D] | Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] |
Rep. Derrick Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2014-05-16 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Derrick Smith |
2014-04-24 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2014-04-23 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2014-04-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2014-04-10 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2014-04-03 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2014-04-02 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-02 | House | First Reading |
2014-04-02 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2014-04-02 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2014-04-02 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2014-04-01 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 19, 2014 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Link |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 009-000-000 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Terry Link |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 18, 2014 |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2013 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 010-000-000 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-01-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 16-35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |