IL SB0350 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-15 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-15 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-28 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 34 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-15 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-28 | Motion Prevailed/Chair Sustained 037-022-000 | |
2009-05-28 | Shall the Chair be Sustained Sen. Rickey R. Hendon | |
2009-05-28 | Appeal Ruling of Chair Sen. Kirk W. Dillard; Senator Murphy | |
2009-05-28 | Chair Rules That the motion be placed in writing, pursuant to Senate Rule 7-4 | |
2009-05-28 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Senator Dillard's- Floor Motion - Pursuant to Senate Rule 7-9, Discharge the Committee on Assignments from further consideration of SFA # 2. | |
2009-05-27 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-27 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno | |
2009-05-22 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Sen. Kirk W. Dillard; Pursuant to Senate Rule 7-9, Discharge the Committee on Assignments from further consideration of SFA #1, and be referred to the Senate Executive Committee. | |
2009-05-21 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-21 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno | |
2009-05-18 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2009 | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 28, 2009 | |
2009-04-23 | Second Reading | |
2009-04-03 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2009 | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2009 | |
2009-03-12 | Do Pass Executive; 012-000-000 | |
2009-03-05 | Assigned to Executive | |
2009-02-06 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-06 | First Reading | |
2009-02-06 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |