IL SB0363 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0096
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0096
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Secretary of State Act. Creates the Task Force on Best Practices and Licensing of Non-Transplant Organ Donation Organizations to review and report on national standards for best practices in relation to the licensing and regulation of organizations that solicit or accept non-transplantation whole bodies and body parts. Provides for meetings and reporting requirements of the Task Force. Provides for appointment and membership requirements of the Task Force. Provides that the Office of the Secretary of State shall provide the Task Force with administrative and other support. Repeals provisions on July 1, 2022. Defines "Task Force". Effective immediately.
Title
NON-TRANSPLANT ORGAN DONATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0096 |
2021-07-09 | Senate | Effective Date July 9, 2021 |
2021-07-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 112-000-000 |
2021-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Human Services Committee; 015-000-000 |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2021-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Healthcare Access and Availability; 009-000-000 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Healthcare Access and Availability |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Healthcare Access and Availability |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |