IL SB0391 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Township Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning contracts relating to insurance.
Title
LOCAL GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
Sen. Terry Link [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2016-07-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2016-07-31 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As December 31, 2016 |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 27, 2016 |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 008-000-000 |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 13, 2016 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Judiciary |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 011-000-000 |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 5, 2016 |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Terry Link |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2015 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2015 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-01-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
60 | 1 | 30-41 | Amended Code | Citation Text |