IL SB0398 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-7)
Status: Passed on May 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0003
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-7)
Status: Passed on May 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0003
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning court costs.
Title
FILM PRODUCT SERV TAX CREDIT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-06 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0003 |
2011-05-06 | Senate | Effective Date May 6, 2011 |
2011-05-06 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2011-04-08 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2011-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-07 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-07 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 007-000-000 |
2011-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2011-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2011-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2011-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2011-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Franco Coladipietro |
2011-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael G. Connelly |
2011-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr. |
2011-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2011-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2011-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelo Saviano |
2011-04-07 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed |
2011-04-07 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 25 Revenue & Finance Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2011-04-06 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2011-04-06 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris |
2011-04-06 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Mell |
2011-04-05 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2011-03-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-30 | House | First Reading |
2011-03-30 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris |
2011-03-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-03-30 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-03-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2011-03-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-003 |
2011-03-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Jacobs |
2011-03-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2011-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 30, 2011 |
2011-03-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Cullerton |
2011-03-30 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2011-03-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Lauzen |
2011-03-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 008-000-000 |
2011-03-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christine Radogno |
2011-03-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2011-03-30 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2011-03-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2011-03-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2011-03-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2011-03-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Susan Garrett |
2011-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Revenue |
2011-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2011-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2011 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2011 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 015-000-000 |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 1106 | Amended Code | Citation Text |