IL SB0401 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0073
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0073
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the sunset of exemptions, credits, and deductions.
Title
USE TAX-CENTRALIZED PURCHASING
Sponsors
Sen. Toi Hutchinson [D] | Sen. Don Harmon [D] | Sen. Bill Brady [R] | Rep. Dan Brady [R] |
Rep. Jack Franks [D] | Rep. Keith Farnham [D] | Rep. Carol Sente [D] | Rep. Patricia Bellock [R] |
Rep. Linda LaVia [D] | Rep. Monique Davis [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-30 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0073 |
2011-06-30 | Senate | Effective Date June 30, 2011 |
2011-06-30 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2011-06-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2011-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2011-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2011-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2011-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2011-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2011-05-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2011-05-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-20 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-18 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2011-05-16 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed by Voice Vote |
2011-05-16 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 25 Executive Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2011-05-13 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 20, 2011 |
2011-04-25 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2011-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-15 | House | First Reading |
2011-04-15 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2011-04-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-04-15 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Hutchinson |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2011-04-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 010-000-000 |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2011 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2011 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 015-000-000 |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 250 | Amended Code | Citation Text |