IL SB0409 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1053
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1053
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the collection of tax.
Title
PROP TX-SPECIAL SERVICE AREA
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-29 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 85 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 85 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-23 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1053 |
2012-08-23 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2013 |
2012-08-23 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2012-06-27 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2012-05-29 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2012-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 053-000-000 |
2012-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Revenue; 006-000-000 |
2012-05-25 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Revenue |
2012-05-24 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2012-05-24 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Terry Link |
2012-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 3 - May 23, 2012 |
2012-05-22 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 3 |
2012-05-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2012-05-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 085-033-000 |
2012-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2012-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2012-05-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-05-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2012-05-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-05-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2012-05-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2012-05-03 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-03 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 008-001-000 |
2012-05-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-05-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2012-04-26 | House | Remains in Revenue & Finance Committee |
2012-04-26 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 003-000-000 |
2012-04-16 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2012-03-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-29 | House | First Reading |
2012-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2012-03-29 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2012-03-29 | House | Arrived in House |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Link |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Link |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 012-000-000 |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 008-001-000 |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Revenue |
2012-03-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2012-03-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2012-03-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Terry Link |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 6, 2012 |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2011-07-23 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 4, 2011 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2011 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2011 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 015-000-000 |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 31-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |