IL SB0588 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the transportation of pupils.
Title
EDUCATION-TECH
Sponsors
Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Martin Sandoval [D] | Sen. Kimberly Lightford [D] | Sen. William Delgado [D] |
Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] | Sen. Donne Trotter [D] | Sen. Napoleon Harris [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-09 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 16, 2014 |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 8, 2014 |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 1, 2014 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), Amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 2, 2014 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2013 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 010-000-000 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 29-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |