IL SB0633 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-11-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0593
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-11-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0593
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Utilities Act. Makes a technical change in the short title Section.
Title
REGULATION-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-11-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-15 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0593 |
2013-11-15 | Senate | Effective Date November 15, 2013 |
2013-11-15 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2013-11-15 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-11-07 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2013-11-07 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000 |
2013-11-07 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2013-11-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-11-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-11-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-11-05 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 013-000-000 |
2013-10-30 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2013-10-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 30, 2013 |
2013-10-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-10-30 | House | First Reading |
2013-10-29 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2013-10-24 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2013-10-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-10-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2013-10-23 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2013-10-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2013-10-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Kotowski |
2013-10-23 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2013-10-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 012-000-000 |
2013-10-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2013-10-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-10-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2013-10-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading October 23, 2013 |
2013-10-22 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2013-10-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As November 7, 2013 |
2013-10-22 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2013 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 010-000-000 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 5 | 1-101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |