IL SB0669 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on November 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-08 - Total Veto Stands
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on November 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-08 - Total Veto Stands
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code. Provides that for the 2020 election and thereafter, the chairman of the Lake County board shall be elected by the voters of the county. Provides that an individual seeking election as chairman of the Lake County board may also seek election as a county board member. Amends the Election Code making conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
LAKE COUNTY - BOARD CHAIRMAN
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 61 N: 50 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 33 N: 18 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 33 N: 18 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-08 | Senate | Total Veto Stands |
2017-10-24 | Senate | Placed Calendar Total Veto |
2017-08-18 | Senate | Governor Vetoed |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 061-050-000 |
2017-05-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-05-26 | House | Removed from Short Debate Status |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 004-002-000 |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-16 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2017-05-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-05-09 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-05-09 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 033-018-000 |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 26, 2017 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 6, 2017 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Local Government; 006-003-000 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Local Government |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 2A-1.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 2-3007 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 2-3009 | Amended Code | Citation Text |