IL SB0707 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0412
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0412
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Personal Information Protection Act. Provides that a State agency that has been subject to a single breach or aggravated computer tampering to the security of its data shall submit a comprehensive report to the Attorney General and the General Assembly. Specifies the content of the report. Requires the report to be made available to the public. Effective immediately.
Title
PERSONAL INFO PRTCT AGENCY RPT
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Hastings [D] | Sen. Michael Connelly [R] | Sen. William Cunningham [D] | Rep. Peter Breen [R] |
Rep. Mike Fortner [R] | Rep. Keith Wheeler [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-25 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0412 |
2017-08-25 | Senate | Effective Date August 25, 2017 |
2017-08-25 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2017-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 055-000-000 |
2017-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 008-000-000 |
2017-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government |
2017-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2017-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2017-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-05-30 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2017-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen |
2017-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-25 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-16 | House | Assigned to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee |
2017-05-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-11 | House | First Reading |
2017-05-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2017-05-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Hastings |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 007-000-000 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 3, 2017 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended State Government; 008-000-000 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
815 | 530 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |