IL SB0758 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-16 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-16 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Governmental Ethics Act. Provides that no legislator may negotiate for employment with a lobbying entity that engages in lobbying with members of the General Assembly during the legislator's term of office. Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Provides that a member may not, within a period of one year immediately after termination of the member's most recent term of office, engage in lobbying with members of the General Assembly, if the member accepts compensation specifically attributable to that lobbying.
Title
ETHICS-MEMBER LOBBYING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2015-10-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015 |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2015 |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2015 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Duffy |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2015-02-19 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Governmental Operations |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Darin M. LaHood |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 420 | 2-115 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | 5-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=758&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB0758.htm |