IL SB0764 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Toll Highway Act. Increases the number of directors of the Illinois State Toll Highway Authority appointed by the Governor from 9 to 11. Provides that, of the 11 directors of the Authority appointed by the Governor, at least one shall be from Cook County, at least one shall be from Lake County, at least one shall be from DuPage County, at least one shall be from Will County, at least one shall be from Winnebago, Boone, or McHenry County, and at least one shall be from Kane, DeKalb, Ogle, or Lee County. Provides that no more than 6 (rather than 5) directors shall be from the same political party. Provides that, within 30 days of the effective date of the amendatory Act, the Governor shall appoint one director from Lake County and one director from Winnebago, Boone, or McHenry County. Effective immediately.
Title
TOLL HWY AUTHORITY DIRECTORS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 048-000-000 |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Bush |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 009-000-000 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Melinda Bush |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 18d-101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |