IL SB1032 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-15 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-15 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Capital Crimes Litigation Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning reports to the General Assembly by the Cook County Public Defender, the Cook County State's Attorney, the State Appellate Defender, the State's Attorneys Appellate Prosecutor, and the Attorney General on the receipt and use of certain funds.
Title
CRIMINAL LAW-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-15 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 28, 2009 | |
2009-04-23 | Second Reading | |
2009-04-03 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2009 | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2009 | |
2009-03-12 | Do Pass Executive; 012-000-000 | |
2009-03-05 | Assigned to Executive | |
2009-02-06 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-06 | First Reading | |
2009-02-06 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1032&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB1032.htm |