IL SB1129 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-7)
Status: Passed on August 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0371
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-7)
Status: Passed on August 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0371
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE-SYNTHETIC
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-14 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0371 |
2015-08-14 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2016 |
2015-08-14 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2015-05-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2015-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-18 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2015-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony |
2015-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2015-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2015-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-14 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 014-000-000 |
2015-05-08 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 15, 2015 |
2015-05-04 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2015-04-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-28 | House | First Reading |
2015-04-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2015-04-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; McCarter |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 012-000-000 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Duffy |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kyle McCarter |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kyle McCarter |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2015 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2015 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
725 | 5 | 100-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |