IL SB1155 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Use Tax Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
REVENUE-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-26 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023 |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (b-1), the following amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Craig Wilcox |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Craig Wilcox |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023 |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10(a) Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023 |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 28, 2023 |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2023 |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023 |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000 |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 105 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |