IL SB1164 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the Abuse of Adults with Disabilities Intervention Act. Amends the Elder Abuse and Neglect Act. Changes the short title of the Act to the Adult Protective Services Act and amends various Acts to change references to the short title. Adds and defines new terms. Provides that within 6 months, the Department on Aging shall establish a centralized Adult Protective Services Helpline for the purposes of reporting the abuse, neglect, or financial exploitation of an eligible adult. Requires the Department on Aging to make the helpline accessible 24 hours a day, 7 days a week and to post its telephone number online. Requires the Department on Aging to report to the Department of Public Health's health care worker registry the identity and administrative finding against any caregiver of a verified and substantiated decision of significant abuse, neglect, or financial exploitation of an eligible adult. Contains provisions concerning notice to caregivers; report challenges; registry hearings; a caregiver's rights to collateral action; removal from the registry; and the referral of registry reports to health care facilities; the establishment of a Statewide Fatality Review Team; and other matters. Effective July 1, 2013.
Title
AGING-TECH
Sponsors
Sen. William Haine [D] | Sen. Iris Martinez [D] | Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant [D] | Sen. Julie Morrison [D] |
Sen. Steve Stadelman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2013-08-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Re-referred to Assignments; 3-9(b) |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Judiciary |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2013 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 20, 2013 |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 012-000-000 |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-01-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |