IL SB1170 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0119
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0119
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Wildlife Code. Creates a prohibition on possession of wildlife or parts of wildlife that were taken in a manner that is illegal in the territory where the animal was taken. Additionally defines the statute of limitations on prosecution of violations.
Title
UNLAWFUL POSS. OF WILDLIFE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-30 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0119 |
2013-07-30 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2014 |
2013-07-30 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-03 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr. |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-03 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2013-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-01 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-30 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 014-000-000 |
2013-04-08 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2013-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-01 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-01 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Edward J. Acevedo |
2013-03-01 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 1, 2013 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 28, 2013 |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Do Pass Agriculture and Conservation; 008-000-000 |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture and Conservation |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-01-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pat McGuire |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
520 | 5 | 2.33 | Amended Code | Citation Text |