IL SB1299 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Creates the offenses of driving with a screen device operating, a Class 1, 3, or 4 felony or a Class A misdemeanor depending on specified circumstances, and unlawful installation of television, monitor, or similar device, a Class A misdemeanor. Provides that a person commits the offense of driving with a screen device operating when the person is driving a motor vehicle that has a television, video monitor, portable computer, or any other similar means operating that is capable of providing a visual display in full view of a driver in a normal driving position while the motor vehicle is in motion. Provides that a person commits the offense of unlawful installation of television, monitor, or similar device if the person installs or alters a television, video monitor, portable computer, or any other similar means capable of providing a visual display that is in full view of a driver of a motor vehicle in a normal driving position while the motor vehicle is in motion. Provides several exceptions and an affirmative defense. Renames a "cellular radio telecommunication device" as a "mobile communication device", and modifies the definitions of a "mobile communication device" and "using a mobile communication device" to prohibit text messaging and other similar uses of mobile communication devices (instead of prohibiting just talking, listening to, and dialing telephonic communications) for purposes of expanding a provision prohibiting the use of mobile communication devices by school bus drivers. Repeals a provision relating to the use of video devices while driving. Effective immediately.
Title
VEH CD-VIDEO DEVICES-DRIVING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-03 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-13 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 3, 2009 | |
2009-03-11 | Held in Transportation | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted | |
2009-03-04 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation | |
2009-02-27 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-27 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein | |
2009-02-18 | Assigned to Transportation | |
2009-02-10 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-10 | First Reading | |
2009-02-10 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1299&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB1299.htm |