IL SB1360 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that if it is determined that a person who is charged with committing an offense while confined by the Department of Corrections is indigent and eligible for representation by the public defender, the expense of the defense shall be paid by the Department (rather than in all cases of prisoner crime committed while the prisoner is confined by the Department the expense of prosecution shall be paid by the Department).
Title
CRIMES BY COMMITTED PERSONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Brian W. Stewart |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 3-6-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1360&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1360.htm |