IL SB1381 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-11-30 - Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-11-30 - Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Compassionate Use of Medical Cannabis Pilot Program Act. Provides that when a person has been diagnosed by a physician as having a debilitating medical condition, the person and the person's primary caregiver may be issued a registry identification card by the Department of Public Health that permits the person or the person's primary caregiver to legally possess no more than 7 dried cannabis plants and 2 ounces of dried usable cannabis. Amends the Cannabis Control Act to make conforming changes. Provides that the provisions of the Act are severable. Provides that the Act is repealed 3 years after its effective date. Repeals the research provisions of the Cannabis Control Act. Effective immediately.
Title
MEDICAL CANNABIS
Sponsors
Sen. William Haine [D] | Sen. Linda Holmes [D] | Sen. Iris Martinez [D] | Sen. Kwame Raoul [D] |
Sen. Jeffrey Schoenberg [D] | Sen. Ira Silverstein [D] | Sen. Donne Trotter [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-05-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 28 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-11-30 | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed | |
2010-11-30 | Third Reading - Consideration Postponed | |
2010-11-30 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo | |
2010-11-30 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios | |
2010-11-16 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate | |
2010-11-16 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote | |
2010-11-16 | Recalled to Second Reading - Standard Debate | |
2010-11-15 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 | |
2010-11-12 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-11-12 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang | |
2010-11-10 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate | |
2010-11-10 | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-001-000 | |
2010-11-10 | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 11, 2011 | |
2010-05-28 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-05-07 | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 28, 2010 | |
2010-04-29 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y Lilly | |
2010-04-28 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel | |
2010-04-15 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate | |
2010-04-15 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate | |
2010-04-15 | Recalled to Second Reading - Standard Debate | |
2010-02-18 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto | |
2010-02-10 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris | |
2010-01-29 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate | |
2010-01-27 | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-002-000 | |
2009-12-01 | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-10-29 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin | |
2009-05-31 | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 30, 2009 | |
2009-05-29 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelo Saviano | |
2009-05-29 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate | |
2009-05-29 | Second Reading - Standard Debate | |
2009-05-28 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate | |
2009-05-28 | Do Pass / Standard Debate Human Services Committee; 004-003-000 | |
2009-05-28 | Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed | |
2009-05-28 | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 25 Human Services Committee; Rep. Lou Lang | |
2009-05-28 | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. John A. Fritchey | |
2009-05-28 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John A. Fritchey | |
2009-05-28 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen A. Yarbrough | |
2009-05-28 | Assigned to Human Services Committee | |
2009-05-28 | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2009 | |
2009-05-28 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-05-28 | First Reading | |
2009-05-27 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-05-27 | Arrived in House | |
2009-05-27 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) | |
2009-05-27 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) | |
2009-05-27 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) | |
2009-05-27 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) | |
2009-05-27 | Third Reading - Passed; 030-028-001 | |
2009-05-27 | Verified | |
2009-05-27 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-27 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Adopted; Haine | |
2009-05-27 | Recalled to Second Reading | |
2009-05-27 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes | |
2009-05-27 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul | |
2009-05-15 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter | |
2009-04-30 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2009 | |
2009-04-30 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2009 | |
2009-04-29 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 006-002-000 | |
2009-04-28 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Assignments Refers to Public Health | |
2009-04-28 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-04-28 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine | |
2009-04-22 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Postponed - Public Health | |
2009-04-22 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Postponed - Public Health | |
2009-04-22 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Public Health | |
2009-04-22 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Public Health | |
2009-04-15 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Public Health | |
2009-04-15 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Public Health | |
2009-04-15 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Public Health | |
2009-04-15 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health | |
2009-04-03 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2009 | |
2009-03-31 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 1, 2009 | |
2009-03-31 | Second Reading | |
2009-03-27 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-27 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine | |
2009-03-27 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-27 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine | |
2009-03-26 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-26 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine | |
2009-03-26 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-26 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine | |
2009-03-26 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 30, 2009 | |
2009-03-26 | Do Pass Public Health; 006-002-000 | |
2009-03-23 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg | |
2009-03-13 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 3, 2009 | |
2009-03-05 | To Public Health Subcommittee on Special Issues | |
2009-02-19 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez | |
2009-02-18 | Assigned to Public Health | |
2009-02-11 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-11 | First Reading | |
2009-02-11 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |