IL SB1381 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-03 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-03 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Finance Act. Creates the Grade Crossing Separation Fund as a special fund in the State treasury. Provides that $5,000,000 shall be transferred to the Fund from the Motor Fuel Tax Fund each month. Provides that moneys in the Fund shall be used by the Department of Transportation to separate railroad crossings used by passenger rail operators. Provides that the Department may adopt rules to administer the Fund. Effective immediately.
Title
FINANCE-GRADE CROSSING FUND
Sponsors
Sen. Martin Sandoval [D] | Sen. John Millner [R] | Sen. Emil Jones [D] | Sen. Toi Hutchinson [D] |
Sen. Edward Maloney [D] | Sen. Arthur Wilhelmi [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Steven Landek [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 16 N: 35 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2011-05-03 | Senate | Third Reading - Lost; 016-035-000 |
2011-04-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1) - Referred to Transportation |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 4, 2011 |
2011-04-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2011-04-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. A. J. Wilhelmi |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Edward D. Maloney |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Millner |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 12, 2011 |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2011 |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Transportation; 009-000-000 |
2011-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2011-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2011-03-01 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2011-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2011-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2011-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.786 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 6z-87 | New Code | See Bill Text |