IL SB1381 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-31 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0798
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-31 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0798
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Vehicle Code to allow a vehicle or pedestrian to enter an intersection under direction of a flashing yellow traffic-control signal, but yield to pedestrians and other vehicles already lawfully within the intersection. Effective immediately.
Title
FLASHING YELLOW RIGHT-OF-WAY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-31 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0798 |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Effective Date July 31, 2014 |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2014-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-08 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-001 |
2014-05-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-07 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-27 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 010-000-000 |
2014-03-13 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2013-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-08 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2013-03-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-14 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-14 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon-Booth |
2013-03-13 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 1, 2013 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 28, 2013 |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Transportation; 015-000-000 |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 11-306 | Amended Code | Citation Text |