IL SB1401 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0216
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0216
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Downstate Police Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that a municipality having a population of less than 5,000 may terminate its participation under the Downstate Police Article and close its fund under specified circumstances. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-ART 3-END PARTICIPATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-13 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-10 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0216 | |
2009-08-10 | Effective Date August 10, 2009 | |
2009-08-10 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-13 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-13 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-12 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-07 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-07 | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel and Pensions Committee; 009-000-000 | |
2009-05-06 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin A. McCarthy | |
2009-04-14 | Assigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee | |
2009-03-26 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-26 | First Reading | |
2009-03-26 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. James D. Brosnahan | |
2009-03-26 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-03-26 | Arrived in House | |
2009-03-26 | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 | |
2009-03-24 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2009 | |
2009-03-24 | Second Reading | |
2009-03-06 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2009 | |
2009-03-06 | Do Pass as Amended Pensions and Investments; 010-000-000 | |
2009-03-05 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted | |
2009-03-04 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Pensions and Investments | |
2009-03-03 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-03 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Edward D. Maloney | |
2009-02-27 | Held in Pensions and Investments | |
2009-02-18 | Assigned to Pensions and Investments | |
2009-02-11 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-11 | First Reading | |
2009-02-11 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Edward D. Maloney |